Everett, Tobias Christopher (CPSO#: 93998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Apr 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesiology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tobias C. Everett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Everett ( CPSO# 93998 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesiology
555 Unversity Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 02 Aug 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Aug 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 28 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 12 Apr 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Tobias Christopher Everett may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anaesthesia,  University  of Toronto, in which Dr. Everett holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Everett no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.