Everson, Jennifer Maureen (CPSO#: 90780)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Summerville FM Teaching Unit
7th Floor
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 272-9900
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward A. Everson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Everson ( CPSO# 72632 )
Dr. J. Everson ( CPSO# 90780 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Glen Erin Family Medicine Clinic
Suite 11
2318 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1C7
Phone Number: (905) 828-1145

Business Address:
Summerville FM Teaching Unit
101 Queensway West
7th Floor
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 272-9900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER MAUREEN EVERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2012