Evoy, Andrea Mary (CPSO#: 86951)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2000
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: (519) 370-4048
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Evoy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Evoy ( CPSO# 86951 )

Business Address:
Suite 2000
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 470-3030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA MARY EVOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVOY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009