Ewerton Cristovao, Davi (CPSO#: 97191)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Fundacao Universidade Do Amazonas (UFAM), 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2012 to 26 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2013