Ezer, Darren Paul (CPSO#: 83192)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Darren Ezer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ezer ( CPSO# 83192 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARREN PAUL EZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EZER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2010