Fadaz, Annissa (CPSO#: 92214)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:UNIVERSITE DE LOME AU TOGO, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
336 Donald Street
Ottawa ON  K1K 1M5
Phone: (613) 563-2121
Fax: (613) 563-1331
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Annissa Fadaz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 15 2013


Corporation Name: Dr. Annissa Fadaz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fadaz ( CPSO# 92214 )

Business Address:
336 Donald Street
Ottawa ON  K1K 1M5
Phone Number: (613) 563-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNISSA FADAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FADAZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2009 to 11 Jan 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Jan 2010 to 19 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2011