Faghih, Mehrnoosh (CPSO#: 78171)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Isfahan University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Fertility
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3T1
Phone: (905) 634-4440
Fax: (905) 639-3810
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 - 4271 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2P 2X7
Canada
Phone: (519) 650-0011
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amin and Karnis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Amin ( CPSO# 73115 )
Dr. M. Karnis ( CPSO# 66995 )
Dr. M. Faghih ( CPSO# 78171 )

Business Address:
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3T1
Phone Number: (905) 333-6355


Corporation Name: Akinsooto, Amin, Faghih and Karnis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Amin ( CPSO# 73115 )
Dr. M. Karnis ( CPSO# 66995 )
Dr. M. Faghih ( CPSO# 78171 )
Dr. V. Akinsooto ( CPSO# 88164 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
4271 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2P 2X7
Phone Number: (519) 650-0011


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Faghih Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Faghih ( CPSO# 78171 )

Business Address:
One Fertility
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3T1
Phone Number: (905) 634-4440

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
One Fertility
4271 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2P 2X7
Phone Number: (905) 650-0011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility Effective: 15 Mar 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEHRNOOSH FAGHIH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAGHIH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 7 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2009 to 12 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007