Fahim, Sylvia Emile Fahmy (CPSO#: 81072)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 12
1151 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5C 1C6
Phone: (905) 276-2700
Fax: (905) 276-2706
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S.E. Fahim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fahim ( CPSO# 81072 )

Business Address:
12 - 1151 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5C 1C6
Phone Number: (905) 276-2700

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYLVIA EMILE FAHMY FAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAHIM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2007