Faidi, Samir Abdelmagid (CPSO#: 71753)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Surgery
HHS - General Site
237 Barton Street East
6North Room 614
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-0271 Ext. 44736
Fax: 905-523-5889
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Faidi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Faidi ( CPSO# 71753 )

Business Address:
Department of Surgery
HHS - General Site
237 Barton Street
6North Room614
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMIR ABDELMAGID FAIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAIDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2004