Fainaru, Ofer (CPSO#: 90046)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2008 to 07 Jan 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 08 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Nov 2009
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2009