Fainsilber, Toby (CPSO#: 77365)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2002 to 26 Apr 2002
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Apr 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006