Fairgrieve, Christopher Douglas (CPSO#: 94026)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 2201 1150 Jervis Street Vancouver, BC V6E 2C8
Date Received: 22 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jan 2013 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Feb 2016 to 11 Mar 2016
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2016