Fairhead, Todd Ryan (CPSO#: 77761)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
Division of Nephrology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82763
Fax: (613) 738-8337
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Todd Fairhead Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Pickersgill ( CPSO# 82796 )
Dr. T. Fairhead ( CPSO# 77761 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
Division of Nephrology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TODD RYAN FAIRHEAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAIRHEAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 14 Jul 2002
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2005