Fakhkharian, Faranak (CPSO#: 80344)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Isfahan University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Division of Internal Medicine
Suite 14 702
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 4773
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARANAK FAKHKHARIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAKHKHARIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Dec 2003 to 01 Mar 2004
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2004 to 17 Dec 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 18 Dec 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 18 Nov 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Nov 2008
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2010