Fan, Jerome (CPSO#: 76349)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 905-883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jerome Fan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fan ( CPSO# 76349 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEROME FAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006