Fang, Xueping (CPSO#: 90451)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jun 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Sun Yat Sen University of medical Scienc, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
Room C6.504B
Brant Community Healthcare System
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544 Ext. 4321
Fax: (519) 752-7809
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: X. Fang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. X. Fang ( CPSO# 90451 )

Business Address:
Brant Community-Healthcare System
Department of Pathology
Room C6-504b
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jun 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Oct 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Nov 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Oct 2010 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Xueping  Fang  may  practise  medicine  independently  in anatomical
                  pathology, only.