Fantillo, Vanessa April (CPSO#: 82850)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-5800 Ext. 58525
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vanessa Fantillo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Fantillo ( CPSO# 82850 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VANESSA APRIL FANTILLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FANTILLO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 02 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Jan 2009 to 01 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Jan 2010 to 01 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2011