Fantus, Daniel Michael (CPSO#: 94380)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHUM, Pavillon Edouard-Asselin
1000, rue Saint-Denis
Montreal QC  H2X 0C1
Phone: 514-758-3962

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL MICHAEL FANTUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FANTUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Aug 2010 to 26 Sep 2010
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2014