Farahani, Mozhgan (CPSO#: 87049)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Centre
2nd Floor
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 662-3303
Fax: (905) 662-3304
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southmount Health Care Centre
35 Upper Centennial Pkwy, 2nd flr
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Canada
Phone: 1-855-210-0757
Fax: (905) 662-3304
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

2130 North Park Drive-unit 222
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Canada
Phone: 905-789-1700
Fax: 905-789-1702
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hamilton Community Health Centre
414 Victoria Ave N-unit 6
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8
Canada
Phone: 905-662-3303
Fax: 905-662-3304
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

3075 Hospital Gate-suite 310
Oakville ON  L7M 1M1
Canada
Phone: 905-789-1700
Fax: 905-789-1702
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Farahani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Farahani ( CPSO# 87049 )

Business Address:
2130 North Park Drive
Suite 222
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9

Business Address:
Suite 6
414 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8

Business Address:
Suite 310
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L7M 1M1

Business Address:
Halton Family Health Centre
2nd Floor
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 662-3303

Business Address:
Southmount Health Care Centre
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
2nd Floor
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (855) 210-0757

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 22 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOZHGAN FARAHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARAHANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014