Faraj, Khaled Mabruk (CPSO#: 71190)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 29 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Khaled M. Faraj Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 22 2009

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking for copy of their medical records should e-mail Dr. Faraj at khfaraj1@hotmail.com.
Date Received: 25 Sep 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Feb 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 15 May 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 16 May 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 15 May 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 16 May 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 15 May 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 16 May 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2008