Farber, Noah Jesse (CPSO#: 95174)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Emergency Administration office
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M2N1
Mississauga ON  L5M2N1
Phone: 905 813 4530
Fax: 905 813 4548
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Noah Farber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Farber ( CPSO# 95174 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4530

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOAH JESSE FARBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013