Farhan, Joman Ishaq (CPSO#: 88307)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 20 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Jordan, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Farhan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 6 2012

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 May 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 May 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Aug 2011