Farhang Khoee, Hana (CPSO#: 96119)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2462 Howard Avenue, Suite 126
Windsor ON  N8X-3V6
Phone: 226-674-4120
Fax: 226-674-4121
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hana Farhang Khoee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Farhang Khoee ( CPSO# 96119 )

Business Address:
2462 Howard Avenue
Suite 126
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (226) 674-4120

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital - Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANA FARHANG KHOEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARHANG KHOEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 2016