Farhat, Najwa Fathi (CPSO#: 75739)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
River Valley Medical Clinic
106 Lambert Street
Whitehorse YT  Y1A 1Z2
Phone: (867) 667-6491
Fax: 867633-3804

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan
Yukon

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAJWA FATHI FARHAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARHAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 01 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Oct 2003
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2016