Farkash, Uri (CPSO#: 91896)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2009 to 06 Oct 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Oct 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2011