Farkhani, Nima (CPSO#: 89147)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr. Nima Farkhani MPC
11 Brunel CRT., Suite: 1511
Toronto ON  M5V 3Y3
Phone: (416) 893-4920
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nima Farkhani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Farkhani ( CPSO# 89147 )

Business Address:
11 Brunel Court
Suite 1511
Toronto ON  M5V 3Y3

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
C753 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIMA FARKHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARKHANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013