Farn, Kristen Alyssa (CPSO#: 95380)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 115
210 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 7V1
Phone: (705) 329-1223
Fax: (844) 321-8485
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Aug 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTEN ALYSSA FARN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2013