Farooki, Sophia (CPSO#: 94343)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 952-2818
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sophia Farooki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Farooki ( CPSO# 94343 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 21 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOPHIA FAROOKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAROOKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2013