Farooq, Saqba (CPSO#: 74031)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8407 112avenue
FSJ BC  V1J 0J5
Phone: (866) 765-5655

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAQBA FAROOQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAROOQ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 16 Jan 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 17 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010