Farooq, Warda Umar (CPSO#: 77667)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Urdu

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
kaust
jeddah 481129
Saudi Arabia
Phone: (55) 508-1337

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Aug 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WARDA UMAR FAROOQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAROOQ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 31 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2004