Farrauto, Leonardo Angelo (CPSO#: 68954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences Corp
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 389-4411 Ext. 4365
Fax: (905) 575-2598
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEONARDO ANGELO FARRAUTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARRAUTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999