Farrell, Maureen Ellen (CPSO#: 76117)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Apr 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 03 Feb 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Feb 2003 to 30 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 2003 to 30 Nov 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 25 Apr 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 25 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]


            As from April 25, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Maureen Ellen Farrell
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Farrell to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Farrell has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions.