Farrugia, Mary Michele (CPSO#: 72594)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 3-921; 3rd Floor
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-8553
Fax: (416) 586-8355
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Michele Farrugia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Farrugia ( CPSO# 72594 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
3rd Floor
Room 3-921
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-8553

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 17 Jul 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY MICHELE FARRUGIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARRUGIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 24 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2003