Farrugia, Michael David Patrick (CPSO#: 94234)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Health Centre
Alliston Family Health Team
PO Box 280
36 Victoria Street
Alliston ON  L9R 1S8
Phone: (705) 435-8887
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MDP Farrugia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Farrugia ( CPSO# 94234 )

Business Address:
Windsor Health Centre
Alliston Family Health Team
36 Victoria Street
P.O. Box 280
Alliston ON  L9R 1S8
Phone Number: (705) 435-8887

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID PATRICK FARRUGIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARRUGIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2010 to 29 Sep 2010
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2015