Farsi, Sara Hasan M (CPSO#: 88692)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 2008 to 07 Sep 2008
PEAP - Resident - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2008 to 07 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2009 to 07 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2010 to 07 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2011 to 07 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2015
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017