Fasih, Najla (CPSO#: 82391)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Jul 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 78212
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Winchester District Mem Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
Phone: (613) 774-2422
Fax: (613) 774-0453
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan street
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 432-4851
Fax: (613) 432-8649
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Barrys Bay Hospital
7 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Canada
Phone: (613) 756-3044
Fax: (613) 756-0106
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-5555 Ext. 78212
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Najla Fasih Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Fasih ( CPSO# 82391 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 792-5555

Business Address:
Riverside Hospital
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (513) 798-5555

Business Address:
Winchester District Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0

Business Address:
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7P 1P6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Apr 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 24 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Jul 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Najla Fasih may practise medicine independently in Diagnostic Radiology.