Fasola, Laurie Isabelle (CPSO#: 93851)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidad Central De Venezuela, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Venezuela

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURIE ISABELLE FASOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FASOLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 02 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2019