Fava, Mark Adam (CPSO#: 79007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
835 Paramount Drive
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 0B4
Phone: (905) 561-2200
Fax: (905) 561-2204
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Fava Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fava ( CPSO# 79007 )

Business Address:
Unit 102
835 Paramount Drive
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 0B4
Phone Number: (905) 561-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ADAM FAVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011