Fawcett, Adrian Paul (CPSO#: 93060)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: 905-848-7379
Fax: 905-848-7669
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIAN PAUL FAWCETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAWCETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015