Fawcett, Sonia Theresa (CPSO#: 93043)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Petawawa Centennial Family
Health Centre
154 Civic Centre Road
Petawawa ON  K8H 3H5
Phone: (613) 687-7641
Fax: (613) 687-6808
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sonia Fawcett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fawcett ( CPSO# 93043 )

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Business Address:
154 Civic Centre Road
Petawawa ON  K8H 3H5
Phone Number: (613) 687-7641

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONIA THERESA FAWCETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAWCETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2012