Fazio, Luke Martin (CPSO#: 73647)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
33 Beverly Hills Drive
Toronto ON  M3L 1A2
Phone: (416) 630-1712
Fax: (416) 630-6415
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Luke Fazio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Fazio ( CPSO# 73647 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
Suite 305
4256 Bathurst Street
Downsview ON  M3H 5Y8
Phone Number: (416) 630-1712

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUKE MARTIN FAZIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAZIO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004