Feberova, Jana (CPSO#: 80550)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Apr 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:Charles Univ Prague, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Division of Neonatology
Dept of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2415
Fax: (613) 738-4847
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Janusz Feber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Feberova ( CPSO# 80550 )
Dr. J. Feber ( CPSO# 77150 )

Business Address:
Division of Paediatric Nephrology
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 19 Apr 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 08 Apr 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 May 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Jana Feberova may practise medicine independently in neonatal-perinatal
            medicine.