Fedak-Tarnopolsky, Stephanie Nicole (CPSO#: 88499)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cacic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Cacic ( CPSO# 84266 )
Dr. S. Fedak-Tarnopolsky ( CPSO# 88499 )

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Business Address:
520 Locust Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1V2
Phone Number: (905) 634-5573

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
4288 Village Centre Court
Mississauga ON  L4Z 1S2
Phone Number: (905) 275-0058

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Send a letter to Appleby P O Box 80055 4524 New St Burlington ON L7L 6B1
Date Received: 10 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017