Fefergrad, Mark David (CPSO#: 76129)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
Room FG 38
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4693
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Centre for Addiction and Mental
Health
250 College Street
Room 814b
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 535-8501
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Fefergrad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fefergrad ( CPSO# 76129 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
Room FG38
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4073

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
814B - 250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK DAVID FEFERGRAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEFERGRAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2006