Fegbeutel, Christine (CPSO#: 83541)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 18 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Justus Liebig University of Giessen, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Jul 2005 to 08 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 18 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Sep 2006