Feher, Eszter Virag (CPSO#: 92088)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 10 Sep 2009 to 19 Oct 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 20 Oct 2009 to 13 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Sep 2010