Feilchenfeld, Zachary Hilel (CPSO#: 95747)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave. - Room H434
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6100
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zachary Feilchenfeld Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Feilchenfeld ( CPSO# 95747 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room H434
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZACHARY HILEL FEILCHENFELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEILCHENFELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015