Feldman, Sidney Ira David (CPSO#: 59756)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 330
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 494-7386
Fax: (416) 497-4793
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Baycrest Health Sciences
Suite 1R37A
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 2682
Fax: (416) 785-2863
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sidney Feldman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Weyman ( CPSO# 60967 )
Dr. S. Feldman ( CPSO# 59756 )

Business Address:
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 330
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 494-7386

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8

Business Address:
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIDNEY IRA DAVID FELDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELDMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1989