Fellows, George Fraser (CPSO#: 21836)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fraser Fellows Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Fellows ( CPSO# 21836 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 646-6098

Medical Records Location

Address: Victoria Hospital 800 Commissioner Rd E London ON N6A 5W9
Date Received: 30 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 17 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2018