Feltham, Ian Walter Keith (CPSO#: 84017)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
Psychiatry Outpatients
25 Front Avenue West
Brockville ON  K6V 4J2
Phone: (613) 342-2262
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Canada
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ian W. K. Feltham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Feltham ( CPSO# 84017 )

Business Address:
1 - 25 Front Street West
Brockville ON  K6V 4J2
Phone Number: (613) 342-2262

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5649

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 24 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN WALTER KEITH FELTHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELTHAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2006